Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Madathikandathil

Bishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1956 BornPurapuzha
23 Dec 198024.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 201356.7ConfirmedBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India
9 Feb 201356.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for George Madathikandathil:
Bishop George Madathikandathil (born ) Bishop of Kothamangalam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 11 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 8 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013