Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kallarangatt

Bishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1956 BornKayyoor
2 Jan 198225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Mar 200447.3AppointedBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
2 May 200447.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kallarangatt:
Bishop Joseph Kallarangatt (born ) Bishop of Palai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 18 Sep 2013