Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (Benny Mathew) Srampickal

Bishop of Great Britain (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1967 BornPoovarany
12 Aug 200033.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palai (Syro-Malabar), India
28 Jul 201649.1AppointedBishop of Great Britain (Syro-Malabar)
9 Oct 201649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Great Britain (Syro-Malabar)

MicroData Summary for Joseph (Benny Mathew) Srampickal
Bishop Joseph (Benny Mathew) Srampickal (born ) Bishop of Great Britain

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Great Britain (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 Aug 2016
  • c2+: CB, 7 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016