Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Kochupurackal

Auxiliary Bishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1964 Born
29 Dec 199026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Palghat (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Jan 202055.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabar), India
15 Jan 202055.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
18 Jun 202056.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares

MicroData Summary for Peter Kochupurackal
Bishop Peter Kochupurackal (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Palghat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarangoli, Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopSt. Raphael, Cathedral, Palakkad, Diocese of Palghat (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palghat (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 12 Jun 2020
  • c2: CB, 15 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 18 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Jun 2020

Quantcast