Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Socha, C.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

Titular Bishop of Thunigaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1935 BornWojslawice
22 May 195823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
20 Nov 197338.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gorzów, Poland
20 Nov 197338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
26 Dec 197339.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
16 Jan 201277.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Socha:
Bishop Paweł Socha C.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zielona Góra-Gorzów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,825
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013