Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Spínola, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1656Born
24 Jun 168326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Mar 169841.4AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
16 Mar 169841.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
26 Dec 171559.2DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Pietro Spínola
Bishop Pietro Spínola O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018