Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Boraggini

Deceased

Bishop of Savona e Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1820BornGenova
1 Jun 184423.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 187958.7AppointedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
22 May 187958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy
30 Apr 189776.7DiedBishop of Savona e Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Boraggini:
Bishop Giuseppe Boraggini (born , died ) Bishop of Savona e Noli

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 500

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013