Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Cicala (Cicada)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1510BornGenoa
5 Dec 154333.4AppointedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
21 Dec 154333.5Ordained BishopAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
20 Nov 155141.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155141.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
30 Mar 155443.8AppointedAdministrator of Mariana, France
13 Sep 156050.2ResignedAdministrator of Mariana, France
1565²54.5AppointedAdministrator of Sagone (Sagona), France
7 Nov 156555.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
1567²56.5ResignedAdministrator of Sagone (Sagona), France
30 Apr 156857.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Apr 157059.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cicala (Cicada)
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Cicala (Cicada) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016