Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Fieschi

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1566AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
17 Feb 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
28 Mar 1582AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
1610¹DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luca Fieschi
Bishop Luca Fieschi (died 1610) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 109, and Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,566, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast