Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Lomellini

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517BornGenoa
12 Mar 156548.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156548.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
6 Jul 156548.5AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
7 Sep 156548.7AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
7 Sep 156548.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Sabina
21 Nov 156548.9Ordained BishopBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
17 Mar 157255.2AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
24 Jul 157962.6DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Lomellini:
Cardinal Benedetto Lomellini (died ) Bishop of Anagni

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 107
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013