Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Melchiori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macerata, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1553AppointedBishop of Macerata, Italy
16 Dec 1554Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata, Italy
15 Oct 1571AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
1573¹ResignedBishop of Macerata, Italy
1573¹ResignedBishop of Recanati, Italy
1583²DiedBishop Emeritus of Macerata, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Melchiori
Bishop Gerolamo Melchiori (died 1583) Bishop Emeritus of Macerata

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231, and Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast