Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clemente Cardinal d’Olera, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1501BornCastle of Moneglia
15 Mar 155755.7Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155755.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
13 Mar 156058.7AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 Jan 156866.5DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente d’Olera:
Cardinal Clemente d’Olera O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013