Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Delfino

Deceased

Bishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535¹Born
26 Oct 156530.8AppointedBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece
25 Nov 156530.8Ordained BishopBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece
12 Dec 158752.9DiedBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Delfino
Bishop Aloysius Delfino (born 1535, died ) Bishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 98
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 8, Number 6
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018