Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1564AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
19 Jul 1569AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Chioggia, Italy
8 Feb 1572DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pisani
Archbishop Francesco Pisani (died ) Bishop of Chioggia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170, and Page 254
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018