Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miler Magrath, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
12 Oct 156543.7AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
4 Nov 156543.8Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
14 Mar 158058.2ResignedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
1622²100.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miler Magrath (VIAF: 310665610)
Bishop Miler Magrath O.F.M. Conv. (born 1522, died 1622) Bishop Emeritus of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDown, Diocese of Down and Connor
Ordained BishopPauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 56.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 189
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 7, Number 2
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast