Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Boschi

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1572AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
14 Sep 1572Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
30 Jan 1576AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
27 Jan 1582DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Boschi
Bishop Ippolito Boschi (died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199, and Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 20, Number 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018