Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diodato Gentile, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555²BornGenova
9 Jul 160449.5AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
1 Aug 160449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
6 Mar 161156.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Apr 1616³61.2DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diodato Gentile
Bishop Diodato Gentile O.P. (born 1555, died Apr 1616) Bishop of Caserta

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 138
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 41, Number 219
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 22
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016