Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Andrea Borelli, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652BornJanuen
21 Jun 170048.5AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
27 Jun 170048.5Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
2 Mar 171058.2DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Andrea Borelli:
Bishop Paolo Andrea Borelli B. (died ) Bishop of Noli

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013