Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Imperiali, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornGenova
24 Nov 165355.8AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
30 Nov 165355.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
13 Apr 167476.2DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Imperiali:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Imperiali C.R. (died ) Bishop of Aleria

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015