Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominico Giovanni Cavagnari

Deceased

Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1673BornJanuen
30 Sep 169825.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 171441.2AppointedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Sep 1726³53.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominico Giovanni Cavagnari:
Bishop Dominico Giovanni Cavagnari (born ) Bishop of Sagone (Sagona)

  • a priest for 27.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013