Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Grimaldi, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Albano

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornGenova
6 Feb 167949.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
6 Feb 167949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
23 Apr 167949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
10 Apr 168252.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Grimaldi:
Bishop Angelo Grimaldi O.P. (born 1630, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015