Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Gastaldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616²BornTaggia
12 Jun 167357.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jul 167357.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
13 Sep 167761.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
19 Feb 168064.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
12 May 168064.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
8 Apr 168569.2DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Gastaldi:
Girolamo Cardinal Gastaldi (born 1616, died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1673
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1680, Number 34
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015