Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Molza, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
27 Nov 167964.9AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
30 Nov 167964.9Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
24 Dec 169075.9DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Molza
Bishop Carlo Molza O.S.B. (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Modena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 277
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast