Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Bellincini

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1631Born
28 Jan 167543.0AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
3 Feb 167543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
20 Jul 170068.5DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Bellincini (VIAF: 251745338)
Bishop Augusto Bellincini (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena
Ordained BishopSant Ignazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 21
  • b/c2+: AT, 27 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017