Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Camillo de Mari, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornGenova
23 Jun 166434.4AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
1665¹35.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
13 Jul 167141.5DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Camillo de Mari:
Bishop Francesco Camillo de Mari C.R.S. (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Nebbio

  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 49
  • fn/d: CB, 20 Oct 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016