Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Roverani (Roverano)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Dec 1758AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
10 Mar 1767AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
10 Mar 1767AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
2 Jul 1772DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Roverani (Roverano):
Archbishop Giuseppe Roverani (Roverano) (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275, and Page 384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 455
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,250
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015