Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Caranza

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1641Born
29 Mar 166423.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 168645.5AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
25 Nov 169756.8DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Caranza
Bishop NicolÚ Caranza (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarese Ligure, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceBorgo San Donnino, Diocese of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 33.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,686, Number 31
  • bd/loc: CB, 6 Jun 2019
  • bd/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast