Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simone Cardinal Pasqua (di Negro)

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1492³Born
14 Feb 156168.2AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
12 Mar 156572.3Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156572.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
4 Sep 156572.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
5 Sep 1565³72.8DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simone Pasqua (di Negro)
Simone Cardinal Pasqua (di Negro) (born , died ) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaggia, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Pancrazio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Family tomb, S. Maria della Pace, Church, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a cardinal for .4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018