Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Giovanni Battista Biale

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1785Born
19 Sep 180722.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 183752.0SelectedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
19 May 183752.3ConfirmedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
13 Aug 183752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
26 Jun 187792.4DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Giovanni Battista Biale
Bishop Lorenzo Giovanni Battista Biale (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopCathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast