Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Pallavicino

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare

Titular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa

Administrator of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480²Born
22 Nov 150727.8AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
1 Jul 151737.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151737.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
23 Aug 151838.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
8 Sep 152343.6AppointedAdministrator of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
13 Aug 152444.6DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Pallavicino
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Pallavicino (born 1480, died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 273, and Page 161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 208
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 May 2018

Quantcast