Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Imperiali

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1612Born
19 Feb 165239.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Mar 165442.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165442.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
21 Sep 167361.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Imperiali (VIAF: 8170825)
Lorenzo Cardinal Imperiali (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast