Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Saoli Bargagli, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649¹Born
19 May 167425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular Minor
7 May 171061.3AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
10 Nov 171263.8DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saoli Bargagli
Bishop Giuseppe Saoli Bargagli C.R.M. (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 38.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018