Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Salvago

Deceased

Bishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1560³Born
14 May 159030.1AppointedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy
4 Nov 160646.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
9 Oct 161050.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Gratz
12 Nov 161050.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
21 Jul 161252.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
24 Jan 163271.8DiedBishop of Luni e Sarzana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Salvago (VIAF: 304913822)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Salvago (born Apr 1560, died ) Bishop of Luni e Sarzana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 231
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018