Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cosimo Cardinal Imperiali

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1685BornGenoa, Italy
26 Nov 175368.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175368.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
8 Dec 175469.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Feb 175973.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
13 Oct 176479.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Imperiali:
Cosimo Cardinal Imperiali (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015