Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agostino Maria Salvago, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1553AppointedBishop of Acci (Accia), France
28 Nov 1558ResignedBishop of Acci (Accia), France
17 Apr 1559AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
30 Sep 1567DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Maria Salvago
Archbishop Agostino Maria Salvago O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Genova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 215, and Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018