Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1521¹Born
25 Oct 154928.8AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
1563¹42.0ResignedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
22 Oct 157756.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Ferrero
Bishop Sebastiano Ferrero (born 1521, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ivrea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,549, Number 31*
  • d: AT, 24 Jun 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast