Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Camillo Ferrero

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1537Born
5 Apr 157234.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
9 May 157638.9AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
7 Oct 157639.4Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
13 Feb 158143.7AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
21 Feb 161072.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Camillo Ferrero
Bishop Cesare Camillo Ferrero (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella, Archdiocese of Vercelli
Ordained PriestCathedral, Ivre, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained BishopBiella, Archdiocese of Vercelli

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 292, and Page 214
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,576, Number 14*
  • b/d/op/ob/c1+: AT, 24 Jun 2019
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast