Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Ferrero Fieschi

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
4 Jun 156327.4AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
2 Feb 156428.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Feb 1564³28.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 156428.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Oct 158044.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Ferrero Fieschi
Bishop Ferdinando Ferrero Fieschi (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Ordained DeaconChurch, Chiaverano, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained PriestChurch, Chiaverano, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained BishopAcqui, Diocese of Acqui

  • a priest for 16.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,819
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 7
  • od/op/c01/d: AT, 24 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Jun 2019

Quantcast