Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Ferragatta, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1560AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mondovi, Italy
13 Sep 1560AppointedTitular Bishop of Verissa
30 Apr 1568AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
24 Jul 1572DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Ferragatta
Bishop Girolamo Ferragatta O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 331, and Page 123
  • b: CB, 9 Mar 2014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 66*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018