Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romolo Cesi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533¹Born
12 Jul 156633.5AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
27 Oct 156633.8Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
13 Jun 157845.4ResignedBishop of Narni, Italy
1607¹74.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Romolo Cesi
Bishop Romolo Cesi (born 1533, died 1607) Bishop Emeritus of Narni

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 253
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 21
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 26
  • b/d: Treccani.it, 29 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018