Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Fauno Costacciaro

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1524BornCostacciaro
23 Mar 155833.9AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
1585¹60.7ResignedBishop of Acqui, Italy
12 Jun 158965.1AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
9 Sep 159268.4DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Fauno Costacciaro:
Bishop Pietro Fauno Costacciaro (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 334, and Page 113
  • bp/bd/ab/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013