Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Gromis

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1572AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
1 Jul 1573Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
25 Jun 1585DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Gromis
Bishop Cesare Gromis (died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018