Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal della Rovere

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
26 Jan 156030.0AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
12 May 156434.3AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
16 Nov 158656.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158757.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
7 Feb 159262.0DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo della Rovere (VIAF: 39666334)
Girolamo Cardinal della Rovere (born 1530, died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Pietro in Vincoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 5.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Nov 1586
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 309
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018