Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Pasquali, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1589AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
16 Jul 1589Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
31 May 1604AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
13 Jun 1612DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Pasquali
Bishop Gaspare Pasquali O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Rieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonreale di Rieti
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 287
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 28, Number 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018