Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Panigarola (Panicarola), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1548Born
4 Jul 158638.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ferrara, Italy
4 Jul 158638.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
6 Jul 158638.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
28 Sep 158739.7AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
31 May 159446.4DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Panigarola (Panicarola) (VIAF: 39386576)
Bishop Francesco Panigarola (Panicarola) O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAsti, Diocese of Asti
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Asti, Diocese of Asti

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 167, and Page 121
  • ob/c2+: AT, 29 Apr 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017