Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Girolamo Cardinal Lomellini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607Born
19 Feb 165245.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 165245.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
4 Apr 165952.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Girolamo Lomellini
Giovanni Girolamo Cardinal Lomellini (born 1607, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018