Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Fregóso

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480BornGenoa
5 May 150727.3AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
28 Jul 150828.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Gubbio, Italy
1529¹49.0ResignedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
19 Dec 153960.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Feb 154161.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
11 Nov 154161.9DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Fregóso:
Cardinal Federico Fregóso (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a cardinal for 1.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013