Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lazzaro Cardinal Pallavicino

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603Born
29 Nov 166966.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167067.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
8 Nov 167774.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
21 Apr 168077.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Pallavicino
Lazzaro Cardinal Pallavicino (born 1603, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018