Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Biale

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1787BornGenova
22 Dec 181023.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 184052.5SelectedBishop of Albenga, Italy
27 Apr 184052.6ConfirmedBishop of Albenga, Italy
7 Jun 184052.7Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
12 Apr 187082.6DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Biale
Bishop Raffaele Biale (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016