Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Tramallo

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹BornProtovenere
May 1625³48.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Naples, Italy
15 May 162649.3ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Naples, Italy
16 Sep 162649.7AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
12 Apr 162750.2AppointedApostolic Collector to Portugal
30 Sep 163457.7ResignedApostolic Collector to Portugal
26 Mar 163962.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
25 Nov 164467.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
8 Oct 164972.7DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Tramallo
Bishop Lorenzo Tramallo (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Gerace

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 40
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016